WORCESTER WARRIORS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grassroots sports development, club development for junior sports clubs, promoting good health, educational schemes and social inclusion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Herefordshire
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 December 2009: Standard registration
- Worcester Warriors Foundation (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Panter | Chair | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Alexander Glazier Clegg | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARK GIBSON | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher Pennell | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE HEWETT | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.69k | £211.99k | £341.53k | £255.06k | £294.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £335.81k | £181.18k | £220.12k | £242.13k | £251.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.61k | £126.48k | N/A | £3.33k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF WORCESTER, WORCESTERSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS. 1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY UNION AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF CHARITY 3 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, PRIVATE OR RACIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WORCESTER, WORCESTERSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cecil Duckworth House
Severn Street
WORCESTER
WR1 2NE
- Phone:
- 07920428114
- Website:
-
worcesterwarriorsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window