Accounts and annual returns THE CONGREGATION OF THE MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY OF LA SALETTE

Charity number: 1132104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window