Financial history THE CONGREGATION OF THE MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY OF LA SALETTE

Charity number: 1132104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £133.64k £139.44k £164.61k £173.18k £183.64k
Total expenditure £143.21k £134.00k £149.14k £167.16k £192.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A