THE OAK TREE HOMES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oak Tree Homes Trust is a new charity registered in early 2010. Our vision is to help with the provision of sheltered accomodation and assisted living for elderly people in the South East of England, especially for those which adhere to the ethos of Christianity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 March 2010: Standard registration
- 11 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1166290 OAK TREE HOMES TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.74k | £42.15k | £37.18k | £42.85k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.31k | £34.14k | £27.50k | £25.31k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 10 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 27 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 27 August 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO THE POWERS OVER CAPITAL BELOW THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST (FINANCIALLY OR AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED) WITH THE PROVISION OF LIVING ACCOMMODATION, FURNISHED OR UNFURNISHED, AND WITH OR WITHOUT SERVICES OR OTHER FACILITIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR AND INFIRM ELDERLY PRACTISING MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH RESIDENT IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND, AND WHETHER BY PROVIDING, ADAPTING, IMPROVING, EQUIPPING, FURNISHING, MAINTAINING OR RUNNING HOMES, HOSTELS, HOUSES, FLATS OR OTHER DWELLINGS OF ANY SORT OR BY OTHER MEANS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window