NEWCASTLE CITY JUNIORS F.C. SPORTS CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY OPERATES IN THE DEPRIVED WEST END OF NEWCASTLE AND PROVIDES FOOTBALL TRAINING TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL ABILITIES ENABLING THEM TO WORK WITHIN A TEAM ENVIRNOMENT AND IMPROVING THEIR FITNESS LEVELS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
Governance
- 17 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN CHAMBERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nick Gray | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL WALKER | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
KYLE GEOFFREY BLACKWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 29/06/2021 | 29/06/2022 | 29/06/2023 | 29/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.79k | £133.62k | £152.43k | £193.84k | £241.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.11k | £85.40k | £196.31k | £194.31k | £223.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 June 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 June 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL, AND OTHER SPORTS, GAMES, EXERCISES AND PASTIMES, INCLUDING (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) CRICKET, BASKETBALL, BADMINTON, RUGBY FOOTBALL, TENNIS, NETBALL, HOCKEY AND VOLLEYBALL AND ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN TEAMS FOR FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS: (B)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C)TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newcastle City Juniors
Gibside Gardens
Benwell
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE15 7PP
- Phone:
- 07891325389
- Website:
-
NewcastleCityJuniors.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window