TRINITY BAPTIST CHURCH BEXLEYHEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To know, live out, and share, in the power of the Spirit, God's message that Jesus is Lord. Trinity is a baptist church situated in the heart of Bexley Borough, Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
Governance
- 08 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wanjiku Nyandusi | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esther Haworth | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isaac Osei-Kwame | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jill Margaret Holland | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Horden French | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yohan Kanil Keerthiratna | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Patience Kirby-Smith | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr David Linley | Trustee | 27 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev ANDREW PAUL BANKS | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RONALD ARTHUR NORMAN JONES | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £343.92k | £248.73k | £235.00k | £236.97k | £268.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.84k | £180.96k | £179.55k | £226.97k | £193.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2023 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2023 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND / OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND / OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY BAPTIST CHURCH
TRINITY PLACE
BEXLEYHEATH
DA6 7AY
- Phone:
- 02033252566
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window