BRADFORD DISTRICT CARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1130011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports a range of charitable health related activities for the benefit of service users and staff of Bradford District Care Trust

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £160,775
Total expenditure: £149,660

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRADFORD DISTRICT CARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRADFORD DISTRICT CARE TRUST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.26k £191.18k £105.41k £105.56k £160.78k
Total expenditure £42.78k £157.16k £165.51k £114.97k £149.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL OR SPECIFIC PURPOSES OF BRADFORD DISTRICT CARE TRUST OR FOR ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 05 June 2009 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
New Mill
Victoria Road
Shipley
West Yorkshire
BD18 3LD
Phone:
01274228379