INSTITUTE OF JAINOLOGY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the Charity is to propagate Jain Philosophy and its value through art, culture and education, nationally and internationally, within the Jain and the wider community.In particular, to promote its relevance to today's world with regard to key aspects such as the environment and respect for all living beings. To provide a platform for interaction between different communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 18 August 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Funds received from 294038 INSTITUTE OF JAINOLOGY
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AJAY PUNATAR | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Prakash Patalia | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
AMIT ROHIT LATHIA | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
HIMANSHU JAIN | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
VINAY SHAH | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
KUMAR MEHTA | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
DR MEHOOL SANGHRAJKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DILIPKUMAR RAICHAND SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MR JAY MEHTA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.56k | £8.71k | £7.70k | £8.48k | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.27k | £14.57k | £20.99k | £12.69k | £9.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND PHILOSOPHY OF JAINISM. (B) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND HEALTH, PROTECTION OF ENVIRONMENT AND ASSIST SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE DIRECTORS MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 B PARR ROAD
STANMORE
MIDDLESEX
HA7 1NP
- Phone:
- 02089542825
- Email:
- info@jainology.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window