Ethiopian Orthodox Tewahedo Debre Selam Kidist Selassie Church in Manchester, UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a religious organization we provide a variety of services to the orthodox faith followers. Among the services preaching gospel and liturgy are carried out on a weekly basis respectively where as christening and marriage would take place when there is a demand from service users. All the above mentioned services need resource person and hence we have to invite priests from other part of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Standard registration
- ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO KIDIST SELASSIE CHURCH IN MANCHESTER (UK) (Previous name)
- SELASSIE ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO ASSEMBLY IN MANCHESTER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Solomon Alemu Weldegiorgise | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elesabethe Lelessa | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elsabeth Shawel | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kelemwa Wolde | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melat Ayele | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Seyoum Beyene | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Tadese | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Meron Tesfay | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 02/04/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.60k | £3.60k | £15.86k | £8.75k | £40.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.65k | £6.63k | £37.95k | £9.11k | £19.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 318 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2015 as amended on 22 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S MAIN OBJECTIVES ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHRISTIANS IN THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR ORTHODOX TEWAHIDO BELIEVERS IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS: (1) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF PRINCIPLES (TO PROMOTE AND SPREAD MESSAGE EVER WIDER AMONG MANKIND). (2) TO PROVIDE AND UP KEEP PLACES OF WORSHIP, PAYING MINISTRIES OR PRIESTS, AND HOLDING RELIGIOUS SERVICES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP WHICH HELP GROUPS IN EXPRESSING OF THEIR BELIEF. (3) TO PROMOTE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS GROUPS IN ORDER TO ACCOMMODATE EACH OTHER AND TO PARTICIPATE FOR MUTUAL BENEFIT. (4) TO RELIEF OF A PERSON SUFFERING FROM SICKNESS (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) BY PRACTICE OF SPIRITUAL HEALING. (5) TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS MAY BE DECIDED UPON FROM TIME BY THE TRUSTEES AND MEMBERS. (6) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF BIBLE TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND VISIT OF RELIGIOUS /HOLLY SITES. (7) TO RAISE FUND FOR THE SUPPORT OF 'GOOD' CAUSES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John Street
Salford
Manchester
Selaassie Orthodox Tewahedo Church
Former St John Church of England
M7 2EA
- Phone:
- 07592978663
- Email:
- dskseotc.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window