ALPHA AND OMEGA CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES IN DARTFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Ghana
- Liberia
- Malaysia
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR EUGENE AKPOFURE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Melanie Willey | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSSIE BRUCE-KOTEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.61k | £24.85k | £16.06k | £7.71k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.90k | £24.21k | £19.92k | £8.62k | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 December 2020 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED 3 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 7HT
- Phone:
- 079322004534
- Email:
- office@AandOministries.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window