Accounts and annual returns CALDAY GRANGE GRAMMAR SCHOOL (CGGS) 375 LE JOG RELAY 2011

Charity Number: 1131825
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 26 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 26 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2011 25 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 25 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2010 28 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 28 July 2011 On Time