COBHAM RUGBY & SPORT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Community Sports. This includes Rugby, Tennis, Netball and Lacrosse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £65,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 January 2010: Standard registration
- COBHAM SPORTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- COBHAM SPORTS ASSOCIATION (NO 2) LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haley Dwyer | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Moxon | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard William James Hornby | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tony Balkwill | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Barnes | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Heard | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.97k | £879.25k | £215.56k | £244.40k | £244.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.97k | £276.27k | £306.73k | £197.45k | £330.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £50.00k | £55.00k | £60.00k | £65.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £491.15k | £45.60k | £1.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £104.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £128.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £646.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £276.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 2009, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 JUNE 2010 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 JULY 2010. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COBHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORT; 2 IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN COBHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3 TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS ATTENDING SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES IN COBHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION BY SUCH PERSONS IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORTS; AND 4 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
COBHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD SURBITIONIANS MEMORIAL GROUND
FAIRMILE LANE
COBHAM
SURREY
KT11 2BU
- Phone:
- 01932864441
- Email:
- cobhaminfo@cobhamrugby.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window