ST.ANDREWS YOUTH CLUB, BRANDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Andrews Youth Club, Brandon develops and delivers social education activities for children and young people aged 5-18 years living in the Brandon Byshottles area. The project provides, in the main, recreational and leisure time activities on a centre based, outreach and detached basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 16 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Readman | Chair |
|
||||||
Emma Lawson | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUE FLANNIGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
JACK FLANNIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD READMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE MCGARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL BAINBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.79k | £14.91k | £13.56k | £9.39k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.73k | £1.47k | £5.90k | £6.12k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 YEARS, LIVING IN BRANDON BYSHOTTLES (AREA OF BENEFIT), BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B ADVANCING EDUCATION; C PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN BRANDON BYSHOTTLES (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BRANDON BYSHOTTLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 SCRIPTON GILL
BRANDON
DURHAM
DH7 8BH
- Phone:
- 01913781743
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window