THE FRIENDS OF BUSHY AND HOME PARKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote public enjoyment and understanding of the Parks the Friends organise lectures and walks and man an information point in Bushy Park. We produce a Newsletter and other relevant publications. We raise funds for practical improvement projects in the Parks and work to protect and conserve the Parks' environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 30 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MUID | Chair | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Malone | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harvey | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hugill | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeannie Edwards | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fred Squire | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Heywood | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Robertson | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
IRIS HAWKES | Trustee | 07 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE IVISON | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID IVISON | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PIETER ANTHONY BRIDGE MORPURGO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.03k | £32.18k | £27.00k | £36.47k | £35.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.48k | £11.60k | £20.80k | £30.05k | £30.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 2010 as amended on 08 Nov 2017 as amended on 28 May 2021 as amended on 21 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF BUSHY PARK AND HOME PARK
Area of benefit
BUSHY PARK AND HOME PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Lodge
Hampton Court Road
HAMPTON
TW12 2EJ
- Phone:
- 020 8979 1586
- Email:
- secretary@fbhp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window