ANSAR - UD - DEEN SOCIETY OF UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary charitable activities & social support catering for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALHAJI RASAKI ADEWUNMI YUSUF | Chair |
|
|
|||||
OLABISI YUSUFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOLAJI GBOYELADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.58k | £2.43k | £3.27k | £3.39k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £2.40k | £4.99k | £1.45k | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 MAY 210
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN LONDON, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN UNITED KINGDOM. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF PEOPLE IN NEED. 3. THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH ISLAMIC FAITH. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON,
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 BEECHFIELD GARDENS
ROMFORD
RM7 0EJ
- Phone:
- 07916313902
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window