REFUGEE RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Refugee Radio runs a range of community projects to promote education, racial harmony and social cohesion. These include a weekly mental health support group for refugees and migrants with PTSD and depression. We also run a casework advice service for benefits, education, housing and health. The project was founded around a radio programme and events to enable refugee voices to be heard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £48,720 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEVAL AKRAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tatenda Peter Robertson Chitambo | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shahidul Limon Islam | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GIAMPAOLO BOLDRINI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.94k | £106.36k | £255.09k | £163.53k | £219.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.11k | £74.93k | £136.60k | £216.48k | £232.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | £10.70k | N/A | £48.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
= THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE = PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY = TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS = THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY = TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN BROADCASTING SKILLS AND LITERACY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY BASE
113 QUEENS ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN1 3XG
- Phone:
- 01273234868
- Email:
- info@refugeeradio.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window