WREXHAM AFC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR CHARITY PROMOTES WREXHAM FC ACROSS NORTH WALES AND PROVIDES CORE PROGRAMMES IN SCHOOLS AND TO LOCAL COMMUNITY GROUPS, IT HAS WORKED WITH SHOW RACISM THE RED CARD AND THE PRINCES TRUST OVER THE PAST TWELVE MONTHS AND THE OVERALL AIM FOR THE FOUNDATION IS TO PROVIDE MORE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE COMMUNITIES OF NORTH WALES TO ENGAGE WITH WREXHAM FOOTBALL CLUB.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £2,185 from 2 government contract(s) and £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Shropshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Standard registration
- CELTIC CRUSADERS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE RACECOURSE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Wrexham AFC Community Trust (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Charles Toner | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gannon | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Woodward | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Humphrey Rivers Ker | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Mary Nora Kelly | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Harris | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EVAN GEORGE POWELL | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ROBERT MILLER | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.50k | £127.92k | £91.78k | £102.55k | £145.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.11k | £109.27k | £104.05k | £118.93k | £131.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.82k | £2.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | £360 | £6.29k | £1.30k | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2025 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2025 | 304 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/02/2014 as amended on 07 Dec 2021 as amended on 16 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE, ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; AND 3.4 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE".
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RACECOURSE GROUND
MOLD ROAD
WREXHAM
LL112AH
- Phone:
- 01978294414
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window