Trustees ROCHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130518

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Selina Rodrigues | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||
Nicholas Andrew Sutch | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||
Richard Lewis Hasemore | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||
Jonathan Andrew Peters | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|||
Luciano Marco Domenico Pelosi | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|||
Darren Eric Greening | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|||
David Roger Weatherley | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||
Malcolm George Peake | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||
Judith Anne Pennington | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.