DATUM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DATUM is an international development charity based in London. Since 2009 it has worked across Asia and Africa to help children in the poorest areas of the world gain access to education, healthcare and clean water and safe sanitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
- Guinea
- India
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Senegal
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
Governance
- 21 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEAN BUCHANAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Jasmin Hodgson | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Rawson | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Blomfield | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bishop | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Elsa Buchanan | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.91k | £15.68k | £27.65k | £27.65k | £95.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.93k | £13.23k | £23.21k | £16.69k | £66.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE BUILDING OF SCHOOLS AND FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOSPITALS AND MEDICAL FACILITIES OR OTHER HEALTH CARE ESTABLISHMENTS WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE AVAILABLE 3 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRES TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES 4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINEDION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59-60 Russell Square
London
WC1B 4HP
- Phone:
- 07768862700
- Email:
- dean@dneprojects.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window