Trustees ST DUNSTAN'S CHEAM C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1130320

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Doughty | Chair | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Federica Mazzocato Martinazzo | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne d'Abo | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Hansford | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
How Yee Lee | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liza Anne Elizabeth Shepherd | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Gladwin | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Stevenson | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christianne Lee-Walsh | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.