TREASURES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Treasures Foundation offers supported housing for women who have recently been released from prison, rehab or other community sources. The women we assist are recovering from addiction. We support the women through regular group and one to one work which covers practical support and signposting to other services. We provide an intensive day program and we offer out reach and move on support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£628,878
Donations and legacies | £397.33k | |
Charitable activities | £226.32k | |
Other trading activities | £1.44k | |
Investments | £3.78k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£506,574
Raising funds | £23.73k | |
Charitable activities | £482.84k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £23.73k | |
Charitable expenditure | £482.84k | |
Retained for future use | £122.30k |
People

12 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
- TREASURES OUT OF DARKNESS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Verna Wilks | Chair | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mikela Shields | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Woyengitari Chimuayana Otobo | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mechelle Fiona Jones | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Osunsanya | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.16k | £352.40k | £385.21k | £478.31k | £628.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.49k | £255.04k | £310.82k | £423.05k | £506.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.23k | £44.10k | £81.58k | £254.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £397.33k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.44k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £226.32k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.78k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £482.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £23.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.48k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £408.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF, REHABILITATION, EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PRISONERS, FORMER PRISONERS AND OTHER OFFENDERS; (B) THE PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, EDUCATION, TRAINING, SERVICES, OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO FEMALE FORMER PRISONERS AND OFFENDERS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OR IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEED. PROVIDED THAT THE OBJECT SHALL BE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREASURES FOUNDATION
Crown House
Monomark House
27 Old Gloucester Street
LONDON
WC1N 3AF
- Phone:
- 07709893742
- Email:
- info@treasuresfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window