GURDWARA BABA LAKHI SHAH BANJARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving children's the support they need to stay in education. Families on a low income with a child in school get free uniforms, shoes, clothes. We are here to help families who are struggling financially. Helping Kids Stay Out of Trouble, One Sport at a Time Girls' education girls are being deprived of their rights to education for a number reasons, Provide Support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 18 November 2009: Standard registration
- GURDWARA LAKHI SHAH SABHA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jai Singh | Chair | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gurpreet Singh | Trustee | 27 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Satwant Singh | Trustee | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dharam Vir | Trustee | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAM SINGH | Trustee | 01 February 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £150 | £95 | £2.00k | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £295 | £200 | £105 | £2.00k | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN SAHARNPUR, INDIA BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.'
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eagle Street
Coventry
CV1 4GP
- Phone:
- 07456691691
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window