DOCTORS FOR NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DFN provides scholarships at Nepali medical schools for students from poor rural backgrounds. In return, the students undertake to work in remote and deprived rural areas of Nepal for an agreed period after qualifying. The charity aims to support students both during and after their studies; it liaises with local medical colleges, and carries out assessments of health needs in Nepal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nepal
Governance
- 04 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR KATHERINE SARAH YARROW | Chair | 16 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Stammers Howell | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Lewers | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR NATALIE THURTLE | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS YARROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anne Yarrow | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.82k | £66.86k | £77.85k | £77.85k | £37.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.39k | £58.24k | £57.38k | £57.38k | £55.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL STUDENTS IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE THEIR STUDIES. 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN NEPAL BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE.
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highwell
Hamsey
Lewes
BN8 5TD
- Phone:
- 07525372597
- Email:
- KATE@DOCTORSFORNEPAL.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window