CLACTON CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a place of worship and educational facilities relating to Christian Spiritualism. Holding spiritual healing sessions for those in need. Everybody welcome to attend
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 26 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LILY CHERRILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maureen McNulty | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley McNulty | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Spooner | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cable | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEANNE BURSEY | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Neal | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Groves | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSE SMITH | Trustee | 21 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SMITH | Trustee | 21 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.28k | £0 | £4.73k | £7.10k | £6.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.55k | £3.28k | £7.22k | £6.91k | £9.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 June 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 June 2024 | 487 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 June 2024 | 852 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 June 2024 | 1217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2012
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST RELIGION BY PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND TO PROMOTE THE BELIEFS OF CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALISM; II. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALISM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, COURSES AND INFORMATION; III. TO RELIEVE THE SICK THROUGH SPIRITUAL HEALING ALONGSIDE CONVENTIONAL FORMS OF MEDICINE AND TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clacton Christian Spiritualist Chur
CHURCH
19 Oxford Road
CLACTON-ON-SEA
CO15 3TB
- Phone:
- 01255422691
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window