POST PALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve children suffering from acute or chronic ill health and their immediate families, primarily through the provision of letters, emails or other forms of correspondence which provide encouragement and support to the children and also to occasionally help to provide days out of other activities to raise the spirit and morale of these children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIKKI LOUISE GEORGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ailis Farrell | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEVE GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.49k | £38.16k | £26.25k | £19.11k | £14.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.24k | £15.48k | £16.39k | £31.80k | £18.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 301 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM ACUTE OR CHRONIC ILL HEALTH AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES, PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LETTERS, EMAILS OR OTHER FORMS OF CORRESPONDENCE WHICH PROVIDE ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT TO THE CHILDREN AND ALSO TO OCCASIONALLY HELP TO PROVIDE DAYS OUT OR OTHER ACTIVITIES TO RAISE THE SPIRIT AND MORALE OF THESE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
POSTPALS
62 Strathcona Avenue
Little Bookham
Surrey
KT23 4HR
- Phone:
- 01372453040
- Email:
- info@postpals.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window