HAPPY STAFFIE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To care for and find suitable new homes for stray, abandoned or unwanted Staffordshire bull terriers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HANNAFORD | Chair | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Darren Spruce | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jayne Spruce | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.31k | £321.51k | £259.48k | £309.59k | £368.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.26k | £228.90k | £289.00k | £317.83k | £387.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £120.37k | £12.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS, AND IN PARTICULAR STAFFORDSHIRE BULL TERRIERS, WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY ANY MEANS WHICH NOW AND HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW AND PARTICULARLY BY: (1) AIDING DOGS IN DISTRESS THROUGH INJURY OR ANY OTHER CAUSE AND ARRANGING VETERINARY TREATMENT WHERE NECESSARY (2) FINDING GOOD AND SUITABLE NEW HOMES FOR DOGS IN OUR CARE OR THAT COME TO OUR ATTENTION; AND (3) ASSISTING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS OF INFORMATION, EDUCATION OR IN ANY WAY WHATSOEVER THAT PROMOTES APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION AND HUMANE TREATMENT OF DOGS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Happy Staffie Rescue
Unit 3
4 Lisle Avenue
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY11 7DL
- Phone:
- 03432896163
- Email:
- info@happystaffie.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window