Financial history THE TROWBRIDGE ALMSHOUSES TRUST

Charity number: 1130450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £45.00k £41.50k £46.90k £82.00k £55.00k
Total expenditure £30.00k £69.00k £46.90k £95.00k £48.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A