PAN-ASIA COMMUNITY HOUSING

Charity number: 1136725
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide affordable housing and housing management services, primarily but not exclusively, for persons of South-East Asian origin living in the Midlands who are in conditions of need, poverty or distress, and To advance education and relieve financial hardship for such persons and to provide legal and other advice so as to advance them in life and assist them to adapt within a new community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £28,558
Total expenditure: £32,736

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Staffordshire
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elspeth Jane Bourne Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
COLIN TAMBLYN BOURNE Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
James Roy Luke Trustee 19 May 2016
None on record
JACQUELINE MILLER-DEMIROVSKA Trustee 19 May 2016
SPRING BOARD HOUSING TRUST
Received: 54 days late
John Masih Trustee 22 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.48k £33.34k £37.51k £37.51k £28.56k
Total expenditure £32.94k £33.20k £32.60k £32.60k £32.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 February 2025 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 February 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
116 PORTLAND ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B16 9QU
Phone:
0121420392
Website:

No information available