THE PAUL MCCANN FUND FOR NEEDY CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds from general donations, sponsored marathons, and annual social events such as the Charity Ball and a cricket fixture against the Royal Navy. Grants are made by the charity, to both individuals and other charitable organisations, to provide holidays and adventure trips for young people in need, or with disabilities, and for the purchase of equipment to enhance their lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 July 2010: Standard registration
- 17 December 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £0 | £1.20k | £0 | £1.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 10 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DUDLEY, SANDWELL, WOLVERHAMPTON AND BIRMINGHAM BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR ASSOCIATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DUDLEY, SANDWELL, WOLVERHAMPTON AND BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window