NEWHAM NEW DEAL PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community development and regeneration agent across London Borough of Newham and East London. Services include arts and heritage projects, digital inclusion projects and an accredited Good Neighbours home visiting scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £82,365 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 24 November 2009: Standard registration
- NEWHAM NEW DEAL PARTNERSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
- WEST HAM AND PLAISTOW NEW DEAL PARTNERSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ludlam MBE, JP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margit Bieliczky | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alfred Cranwell | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amalia Loizidou | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Eloise Swales | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ms Farzana Choudhuri | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Maria Taverner | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN LUDLAM | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.69k | £165.38k | £163.91k | £177.81k | £268.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.74k | £133.67k | £156.16k | £164.41k | £251.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £19.11k | £85.68k | £78.16k | £79.52k | £82.37k | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.76k | £19.52k | £26.22k | £49.52k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN NEWHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP; (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP; (G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; (L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; (M) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NEWHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 9
ST. LUKES COMMUNITY CENTRE
89 Tarling Road
LONDON
E16 1HN
- Phone:
- 02073666343
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window