HELP MANKIND LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable causes which benefit the suffering humanity specially aiming for health,education and disasters.Supporting birth operations and elderly and disabled people who are not looked after by their families.Educating new generations to support themselves and providing health support to cancer,hepatitis,tuberculosis and malaria affected people in poor parts of world. Help the helpless
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- India
- Iraq
- Morocco
- Pakistan
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Turkey
Governance
- 23 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fazle Qayum Mr | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hasan Ajmal | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
FAZLE AZEEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £304.76k | £21.80k | £58.81k | £2.07k | £14.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.68k | £175.08k | £116.04k | £44.20k | £24.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 October 2021 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN MANCHESTER, PAKISTAN, INDIA AND SOUTH AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH A PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND ORPHANS, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN MANCHESTER, PAKISTAN, INDIA AND SOUTH AFRICA. 3.3 THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE LIVING IN MANCHESTER, PAKISTAN, INDIA AND SOUTH AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THEIR ACCOMMODATION AND CARE. 3.4 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER, PAKISTAN, INDIA AND SOUTH AFRICA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 RUTH STREET
MANCHESTER
M18 7DR
- Phone:
- 07545585555
- Email:
- sam33@ymail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window