CITY CHANGERS CC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching The Word Prayer & Worship Feeding the homeless TeleMedia Production Conferences Talk Show Media Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Jamaica
Governance
- 13 August 2009: Standard registration
- CITY CHANGERS (Previous name)
- CITY CHANGES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev EZEKIEL EZRA Thompson | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kala Reid | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Thompson | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR BABATUNDE ADEDAPO ODELADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150 | £20 | £50 | £60 | £3.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | £20 | £50 | £60 | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2021 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.2.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Foxborough Gardens
LONDON
SE4 1HT
- Phone:
- 07944986264
- Email:
- kingdomtv@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window