COMPANY PARADISO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's purpose as set out in the objects, contained in the company's memorandum and articles, is to advance education for the public benefit by the promotion of the arts. The Charity has determined that it will carry out this purpose through its mission which is to enable people to tell their stories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Jason Shurey | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ANTHONY TODD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.10k | £17.30k | £15.20k | £26.00k | £12.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.04k | £13.87k | £13.60k | £30.45k | £14.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.49k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 RIVERBANK
SHOREHAM-BY-SEA
BN43 5YH
- Phone:
- 07866981421
- Email:
- info@companyparadiso.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window