WELSH ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION SWANSEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The WICAS charity provides support to those in need in Swansea areas. As an independant body we work together with other organisations to provide better understanding of Islam. We organise classes where the teaching of the Sunnah and Quran takes place.The charity is focused on the employment of Imams in line with employment regulation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,300 from 4 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 26 August 2009: Standard registration
- Welsh Islamic Cultural Association Swansea - Sketty Mosque & Community Centre (Working name)
- UNIVERSITY OF WALES SWANSEA IMAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIAZ HASSAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Radwan Abdo Kaid Abdulla | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mabrouka Abuhmida | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naveed-A-Amman Tasnim | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariwan Abdul Kadir | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mahaboob Basha | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr SHAHZAD ATHER | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||
DR AHMED SALAMAT | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Parvaiz Ali | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
FAROOQ SHAH | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nasir Shahzad | Trustee | 24 August 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.23k | £5.88k | £595.62k | £326.03k | £273.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.79k | £28.77k | £23.40k | £50.97k | £207.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £250.00k | £50.00k | £9.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £590.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £5.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £23.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM). 2) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sketty Mosque - WICAS
(Bethal Uniting Church building)
Sketty Park Road
Swansea
SA2 9AS
- Phone:
- 07891664775
- Email:
- info@skettymosque.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window