Financial history BETEL ROMANIAN PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1131232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £124.18k £104.91k £140.60k £122.53k £143.72k
Total expenditure £112.92k £107.80k £139.99k £146.77k £170.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A