BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE JERUSALEM ACADEMY OF MUSIC & DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and the promotion of the arts for the public benefit by way of financial or material assistance, encouragement and support to the Jerusalem Academy of Music & Dance and such similar organisations, individuals and groups (whether in Israel or elsewhere) as the Trustees shall from time to time in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 29 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Stanley Burnton | Chair | 06 August 2014 |
|
|||||
Lady Gwenyth Burnton | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT IAN MAX | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.62k | £39.11k | £23.68k | £64.19k | £112.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.53k | £38.32k | £24.53k | £63.96k | £111.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WAY OF THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE, ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT TO THE JERUSALEM ACADEMY OF MUSIC AND DANCE ("JAMD") AND SUCH SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS, INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS (WHETHER IN ISRAEL OR ELSEWHERE) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 KIDDERPORE AVENUE
LONDON
NW3 7SX
- Phone:
- 02074312819
- Email:
- sjbuk42@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window