Financial history POVERTY BREAKERS

Charity number: 1131123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.46k £24.81k £24.10k £23.80k £24.95k
Total expenditure £11.51k £21.47k £47.06k £20.74k £30.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £700 N/A N/A N/A