THE NATIONAL INSTRUMENT COLLECTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Following the departure of the chosen Administrator for los Angeles, the charity has been seeking another administrator and continuing to develop its knowledge of and connections with relevant organisations and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 October 2009: Standard registration
- 25 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 28 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
SUBJECT AS AFORESAID AND SUBJECT TO THE POWER OF ACCUMULATION CONTAINED IN CLAUSE HEREOF THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE TO OR TOWARDS THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE ACQUISITION PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COLLECTION OF GOOD QUALITY MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS BOOKS MANUSCRIPTS AND OTHER ARTICLES OF HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE TO MUSIC TO BE MADE AVAILABLE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES FOR PRACTICE PERFORMANCE STUDY AND TEACHING
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window