BILTON GRANGE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1133498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity aims to raise funds for the advancement of education or anything ancillary thereto, considering in the first place the requirements of Bilton Grange Trust Ltd

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 2010: Standard registration
  • 05 July 2011: Funds received from 504339 BILTON GRANGE DEVELOPMENT FUND TRUST
  • 02 September 2013: Funds received from 528771-1 THE OLD BILTONIAN SOCIETY FOUNDATION FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER WAINE Chair 27 April 2015
THE HOUSMAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALEXANDER PHILIP MCCRACKEN OSIATYNSKI Trustee 24 June 2016
None on record
Anup Sodhi Trustee 09 November 2015
NEVILLE PLEVINS FUND (ICW BILTON GRANGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL, DUNCHURCH)
Received: On time
EDWINA ROBERTS Trustee 28 March 2012
None on record
FAITH ST JOHN MATTHEWS Trustee
None on record
JEREMY JAMES WESTHEAD Trustee
FRG LTD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.95k £3.84k £1.24k £183 £0
Total expenditure £5.70k £230 £2.57k £705.19k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 September 2023 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 July 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DUNCHURCH
RUGBY
WARWICKSHIRE
CV22 6QU
Phone:
01788 810217