Financial history MOMENT OF TRUTH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1130838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.85k £73.45k £83.62k £108.29k £117.09k
Total expenditure £77.48k £48.41k £77.90k £85.01k £101.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A