ART OF LIVING FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objects of the Charity are : (a) the preservation of health for the public benefit by educating the public in the teachings and yoga practices of Sri Sri Ravishankar, in the UK (b) the relief of poverty, distress and suffering in any part of the world for the public benefit (c) any other purposes for the public benefit, at the discretion of the Trustees which are exclusively charitable
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 October 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandeep Tulsian | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BHAVESH SANGHRAJKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.23k | £20.98k | £4.63k | £32.60k | £131.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.86k | £21.51k | £9.00k | £29.00k | £132.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 AUGUST 2009 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE TEACHINGS AND YOGA PRACTICES OF SRI SRI RAVI SHANKAR; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (C) ANY OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 Eastleigh Road
Heald Green
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 3EJ
- Phone:
- 07402 943680
- Email:
- sandeep@uk.artofliving.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window