SIDERAS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees shall apply the income and in their absolute discretion the capital of the Trust in promoting the Objects in such manner as the Trustees in their absolute discretion think fit and in doing so may make grants and donations to such institutions, foundations, trusts, individuals and undertakings, at such time and in such manner as the Trustees in their absolute discretion think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 2009: Standard registration
- 22 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ICTHUS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £839.90k | £352.63k | £191.85k | £118.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £277.45k | £351.33k | £192.43k | £118.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £838.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £272.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 30 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 30 April 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 15 June 2012 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 13 June 2012 | 44 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 01 July 2011 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 28 June 2011 | 59 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") OF THE TRUST ARE TO FURTHER SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN DOING SO MAY MAKE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS, FOUNDATIONS, TRUSTS, INDIVIDUALS AND UNDERTAKINGS, AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window