FRESHSTART PSYCHOTHERAPY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FreshStart Psychotherapy offers low-cost, open-ended, long-term weekly psychotherapy to those living or working in the London area, for whom such services would otherwise be unavailable due to cost or lack of availability of the same through the NHS. It provides psychotherapy services through volunteer trainee psychotherapists subject to supervision by qualified and fully accredited practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 September 2009: Standard registration
- 29 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.15k | £23.13k | £25.48k | £39.06k | £83.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.71k | £35.89k | £16.99k | £24.77k | £31.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE RELIEF OF PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTRESS DISTURBANCE OR DISORDER IN MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING:- (SUBJECT TO CRITERIA ESTABLISHED UNDER DIRECTION OF THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY) LONG TERM PSYCHOTHERAPY TO INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD COMMERCIAL MARKET RATES AND FOR WHOM THE NATIONAL HEATH SERVICE IS UNABLE TO OFFER SUCH PROVISION ON A TIMELY BASIS WHERE THE CHARGE TO THE INDIVIDUAL IS SIGNIFICANTLY LESS THAN SUCH CURRENT COMMERCIAL MARKET RATES; AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN, AND THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH CONNECTED WITH PSYCHOTHERAPY FOR TRAINEES, STUDENTS AND PRACTITIONERS OF PSYCHOTHERAPY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window