PARKS FOR PLAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide access to outdoor activities for children in parks and public spaces to help them develop & mature. To raise awareness in equality and diversity through sports, arts, leisure & play. To develop the skills of all children and young people, especially disabled children in such a way that they are better able to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth O'Keeffe | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Swanson | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Kerry | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faye Zammit | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Gray | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaime Bennett | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Taylor | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bull | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Roden | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.24k | £133.47k | £128.58k | £121.60k | £134.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.58k | £123.45k | £126.12k | £138.31k | £127.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £61.75k | £66.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE USE OF OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES IN PARKS AND PUBLIC SPACES: 3.2 TO HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY: 3.3 TO PROVIDE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATIONAL, LEISURE AND ARTS FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATIONAL, MORAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 3.4 TO MEET THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT HELPS THEM PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 3.5 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coronation Road Play Centre
Coronation Road
Selly Oak
Birmingham
West Midlands
B29 7DE
- Phone:
- 07935 702007
- Email:
- team@parks4play.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window