Trustees COLLEGE OF CORPUS CHRISTI AND OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

56 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Christopher Kelly Chair
None on record
Richard Charles Leather Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
Dr James Clark Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Dr Claudia Bonfio Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Dr Chatura Dharshan Goonesinghe Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Dr Ruth Leiper Webster Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Helen Emily Ramsey Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Professor Sam Behjati Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Betty Ying-Wen Chung Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Rachel Claire Lawson Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Dr Emilija Leinarte Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Dr Sarah Anna Marie Loos Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Dr Chiara Martini Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Dr Duncan Robin Hewitt Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Dr Christian Phillip Sorace Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Professor Richard Michael Pasco Fearon Trustee 05 October 2022
FOUNDATION YEARS INFORMATION AND RESEARCH
Received: On time
Dr Jan Stefan Tarnowski Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Dr Oleh Stupak Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Dr Nirupa Desai Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Dr Matilda Elizabeth Gillis Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record