HUGHES HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities activities are to endow, maintain and carry on a College in Cambridge for graduates and for mature-age students qualified to be matriculated in the University of Cambridge and to promote education, learning and research in the University of Cambridge and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£17,071,531
Donations and legacies | £1.45m | |
Charitable activities | £8.30m | |
Other trading activities | £1.12m | |
Investments | £1.95m | |
Other | £4.26m |
Total expenditure:
£12,682,900
Raising funds | £1.34m | |
Charitable activities | £8.51m | |
Other | £2.83m |
£1,256,730 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £40,112 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.17m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.51m | |
Retained for future use | £4.39m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.17m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.51m | |
Retained for future use | £5.65m |
People

116 Employee(s)
65 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 13 August 2010: Standard registration
- HUGHES HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
65 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Nicholson Bowers | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lefan Wang | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Beth Mollett | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zhiwu Wei | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emmanuela Maria Wroth | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mann | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malgorzata Zofia Marschall | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lois Georgina Kim | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matteo Zallio | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natasha Sally Raudon | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kennedy Mbeva | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Florian Jaeckle | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joe Ellis | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Spencer Charles Johnston | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yi Wei | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexis Willett | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Wanja Mwangi | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Wilson | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vasiliki Mavridou | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Harro Dirk van Asselt | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guillermo Serrano Najera | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir Laurence Bristow | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jorge Santos | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Farah Ahmed | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Perla Pucci | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David McCay | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Farnworth | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PAUL NEWBY | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tori McKee | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mahnaz Malik | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jimmy Suen Yan Chan | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Riikka Hofmann | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Tamsin Ford | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lars Vinx | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Hoare | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bart de Nijs | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ricardo Sabates-Aysa | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor William Thomas Irish | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prof Rupert Wegerif | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andreas Stylianides | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Othman Cole | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prof Emanuele Giovannetti | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prof John Doorbar | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sonia Ilie | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gishan Dissanaike | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Tracey | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sara Hennessy | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Martin Steinfeld | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Trotter | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clive Wells | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eugene Shwageraus | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeff Skopek | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Suzanne Turner | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kishore Sengupta | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr NIGEL YANDELL | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr AGNIESZKA IWASIEWICZ-WABNIG | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor AJITH PARLIKAD | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF MICHAEL BARRETT | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr CORINNE ROUGHLEY | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARKUS GEHRING | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|||||
PROF JONATHAN POWELL | Trustee | 01 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM FRANCIS CHARNLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof. Nidhi Singal | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JESSICA WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr WILLIAM NUTTALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84m | £9.51m | £12.93m | £14.26m | £17.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.63m | £7.27m | £9.56m | £11.18m | £12.68m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.11k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.84m | £3.02m | £4.99m | £1.87m | £1.45m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £384.57k | £6.33k | £315.76k | £669.38k | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.95m | £6.02m | £7.13m | £7.49m | £8.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £1.05m | £50.00k | £128.61k | |
|
Income - Investment | £387.30k | £267.66k | £341.42k | £1.20m | £1.95m | |
|
Income - Other | £267.81k | £190.91k | £155.43k | £3.04m | £4.26m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £74.55k | £153.23k | £100.00k | £469.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.41m | £6.02m | £7.85m | £7.86m | £8.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £667.35k | £351.05k | £606.08k | £972.89k | £1.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £37.31k | £50.63k | £56.43k | £64.64k | £85.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £712.00k | £752.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £74.22k | £84.81k | £91.33k | £101.06k | £123.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £549.36k | £893.63k | £1.09m | £2.34m | £2.83m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £36.90m | £36.42m | £36.03m | £35.84m | £39.53m | |
|
Long-term investments | £30.85m | £34.86m | £39.13m | £41.46m | £42.26m | |
|
Other assets | £3.26m | £2.88m | £2.00m | £2.84m | £3.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£363.09k | -£312.19k | -£493.57k | -£537.93k | -£205.02k | |
|
Total liabilities | £22.85m | £22.07m | £22.48m | £22.87m | £22.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER APPROVED BY HM THE QUEEN IN COUNCIL 19 JULY 2006 (CHARTER AND STATUTES SIGNED ON 23 JULY 2006)
Charitable objects
A) TO ENDOW, MAINTAIN AND CARRY ON A COLLEGE IN CAMBRIDGE FOR GRADUATES AND FOR STUDENTS QUALIFIED TO BE MATRICULATED IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE; B) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUGHES HALL
WOLLASTON ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 2EW
- Phone:
- 01223334891
- Email:
- bursar@hughes.cam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window