THE MASTER (OR KEEPER) AND FELLOWS OF PETERHOUSE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peterhouse is the oldest of the 31 colleges within the University of Cambridge and is dedicated to the advancement of education, religion, learning and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£17,606,000
Donations and legacies | £3.49m | |
Charitable activities | £5.60m | |
Other trading activities | £927.00k | |
Investments | £7.59m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£15,309,000
Raising funds | £2.26m | |
Charitable activities | £11.79m | |
Other | £1.26m |
£8,514,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,563 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.52m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.79m | |
Retained for future use | £2.30m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.52m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.79m | |
Retained for future use | £10.81m |
People

205 Employee(s)
41 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 August 2010: Standard registration
- PETERHOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
40 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF ANDREW PARKER | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Grainger | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Faulkner Professor | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Davies | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Thom | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michal Gath-Morad | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tomislav Plesa | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jennifer Thornhill Richards | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alireza Mashayekhi | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Rittman | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Holly Elizabeth Porter | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Gerlach | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Suzanne Slater | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geraint Llyr THOMAS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR NICK ZAIR | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TENG LONG Professor | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SOPHIE LUNN-ROCKLIFFE | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAHAM CHRISTIE | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor JOHN ERNEST ROBB | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTARA HALDAR | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard James Holton | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|||||
DR TIMOTHY KEITH DICKENS | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES PETER TALBOT | Trustee | 22 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN NICHOLAS MOLYNEUX WRIGHT | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR Mari Catrin Jones | Trustee | 01 October 1993 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALEXANDER JOHN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANDRAS ZSAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JAMES NICHOLAS BENEDICT CARLETON PAGET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF SOPHIE ELIZABETH JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER GORHAM LESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JENNIFER MADGE BRAIDWOOD WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SOLOMOS NICOLOAU SOLOMOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Francis Deakin | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR BRENDAN PETER SIMMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor PHILIP CHARLES WOODLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Dr STEPHEN WILLIAM PETER HAMPTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
SCOTT HOWARD MANDELBROTE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MAGNUS JEROME RYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF PAUL ANTHONY MIDGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROBERT IAN ROSS RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.63m | £12.28m | £13.61m | £13.93m | £15.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.14m | £13.30m | £14.64m | £15.45m | £15.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £836.00k | £1.04m | £957.00k | £815.00k | £3.49m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £694.00k | £0 | £167.00k | £629.00k | £927.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.39m | £4.41m | £5.10m | £5.37m | £5.60m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £6.00k | £125.00k | £8.00k | £19.00k | £2.59m | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.71m | £6.96m | £7.39m | £7.14m | £7.59m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £104.00k | £39.00k | £205.00k | £84.00k | £13.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.01m | £10.72m | £12.10m | £12.32m | £11.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £939.00k | £1.13m | £1.28m | £1.87m | £2.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £100.00k | £74.00k | £50.00k | £104.00k | £124.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £849.00k | £758.00k | £759.00k | £934.00k | £1.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.19m | £1.45m | £1.26m | £1.27m | £1.26m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £118.72m | £119.01m | £119.83m | £120.02m | £121.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £234.92m | £266.80m | £262.06m | £253.53m | £261.32m | |
|
Other assets | £17.31m | £3.90m | £5.08m | £10.55m | £9.51m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£6.28m | -£5.50m | -£2.96m | -£2.66m | -£1.30m | |
|
Total liabilities | £40.30m | £28.97m | £28.72m | £31.14m | £29.42m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER OF 28 MAY 1285 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 26 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIGION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Linked charities
- 12 August 2010 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
PETERHOUSE
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1RD
- Phone:
- 01223338200
- Email:
- INFO@PET.CAM.AC.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window