THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALENE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of education to undergraduate and graduate students. The advancement of knowledge and learning by supporting research pursued by academics and by funding research fellowships. The College maintains the Pepys Library, a collection of international significance, which provides an educational resource.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MAGDALENE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

45 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Christopher Greenwood Chair 01 October 2020
DR JOHN MILLINGTON SCHOLARSHIP CHARITY
Received: On time
Peter Asimov-Hofmann Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Zachariah Bond Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Jostein Hauge Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Dr Alexander Bryan Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Professor Linda Fisher Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Klaus Okkenhaug Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Eduardo Gallo Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Simon Ravenscroft Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Alastair Mills Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
SARAH C ATKINS Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
Professor JOHN J ORR Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Dr NICHOLAS ROGER CARROLL Trustee 20 July 2017
None on record
Professor STEPHEN JOHN EGLEN Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR SAUL DUBOW Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr SERGIO BACALLADO Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Rev JOHN MUNNS Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Dr Tijmen Euser Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
Dr ARI ERCOLE Trustee 13 March 2014
None on record
Dr Walid Khaled Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Dr RICHARD ROEBUCK Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Professor LUKE SKINNER Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Professor SIMON STODDART Trustee 22 March 2012
MEDITERRANEAN ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
PROFESSOR AMIRA BENNISON Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Professor EMILY SO Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
CORINNE LLOYD Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Dr ALLEGRE LAURENCE HADIDA Trustee
None on record
Professor CECILIA BRASSETT Trustee
None on record
Professor CARL STUART WATKINS Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR HOLGER BABINSKY Trustee
None on record
Dr GARETH PETER PEARCE Trustee
None on record
Professor ANTJE LUISE DU BOIS-PEDAIN Trustee
None on record
Professor TIMOTHY ARTHUR COOMBS Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR TIMOTHY NORMAN HARPER Trustee
None on record
Professor MARCUS WAITHE Trustee
None on record
Dr ROWAN MARGARET BURNSTEIN Trustee
None on record
STEVEN JOHN MORRIS Trustee
DR JOHN MILLINGTON SCHOLARSHIP CHARITY
Received: On time
Professor Brendan Joseph Burchell Trustee
THE CAMBRIDGE POLITICAL ECONOMY SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Professor NEIL GARATH JONES Trustee
None on record
Dr JOHN ROBERT PATTERSON Trustee
None on record
Professor STUART MARTIN Trustee
None on record
DR JANE HUGHES Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL DUPREE Trustee
None on record
DR HUGHES AZERAD Trustee
None on record
Professor SILKE CHARLOTTE MENTCHEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.70m £10.27m £12.61m £13.37m £14.82m
Total expenditure £10.31m £9.53m £11.69m £13.49m £13.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.87m £1.66m £2.62m £3.73m £2.42m
Income - Other trading activities £1.35m £60.39k £175.27k £647.76k £1.26m
Income - Charitable activities £4.98m £4.93m £6.24m £6.40m £6.76m
Income - Endowments £1.05m £290.38k £291.75k £1.80m £230.14k
Income - Investment £4.00m £3.53m £3.73m £4.21m £4.36m
Income - Other £542.36k £386.81k £138.10k £182.35k £253.25k
Income - Legacies £221.41k £192.54k £26.30k £129.87k £28.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.67m £7.87m £9.08m £10.74m £11.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.43m £1.02m £1.15m £1.75m £1.87m
Expenditure - Governance £87.77k £78.02k £91.06k £111.95k £110.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £198.54k £225.46k £288.92k £288.05k £265.17k
Expenditure - Other £203.45k £637.79k £1.46m £994.13k £156.60k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £104.00m £108.37m £106.83m £105.36m £103.82m
Long-term investments £80.59m £92.47m £93.93m £101.34m £103.52m
Other assets £12.83m £6.28m £8.09m £6.95m £7.88m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.63m -£1.88m -£1.97m -£2.01m -£1.05m
Total liabilities £10.54m £9.85m £9.76m £9.80m £9.79m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 26 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MAGDALENE COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0AG
Phone:
01223332100