THE MANOR HOUSE CENTRE FOR PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MHCPC provides or facilitates education and training in psychotherapy and counselling for the relief of persons suffering from emotional disabilities by the provision of an affordable counselling service. It offers a one year part time Certificate Course in Counselling Skills and a three year part time Diploma in Psychodynamic Counselling and Therapy in the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 24 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Louise Bragoli | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saral Markanday | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lewis | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Grunwald | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Hommel | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.80k | £215.81k | £218.50k | £213.29k | £213.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.25k | £191.13k | £199.64k | £206.75k | £222.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR VOLUNTARY AND PROFESSIONAL WORKERS IN PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING AND B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM EMOTIONAL DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING SERVICE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 EAST END ROAD
LONDON
N3 2SY
- Phone:
- 02083710180
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window