WEST RIDING CAT WELFARE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Intention to donate sums of money to other organisations in the furtherance of cat welfare. Activity of Trust not commenced until February 2010
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Leeds City
Governance
- 25 August 2009: Standard registration
- 09 July 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2010 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 22 May 2011 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 28 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL GRANTS TOWARDS THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window